Simmons, William Wayne (CPSO#: 58109)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
300 Plains Road East
Burlington ON  L7T 2C6
Phone: (905) 639-6011
Fax: (905) 639-0516
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: William W. Simmons Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Simmons ( CPSO# 58109 )

Business Address:
300 Plains Road East
Burlington ON  L7T 2C6
Phone Number: (905) 639-6011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 23 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM WAYNE SIMMONS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMMONS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1988