Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Simon, Barry Joshua (CPSO#: 55495)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit I
989 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6C 2C6
Phone: (416) 921-6500
Fax: (416) 921-6321
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Barry Simon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Simon ( CPSO# 55495 )

Business Address:
1 - 989 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6C 2C6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 11 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARRY JOSHUA SIMON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1986