Simon, Gary Sherwin (CPSO#: 53573)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Sep 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Sep 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Room C2 166
P O Box 5010
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8300 Ext. 58525
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Pediatric Dentistry and Orthodontic
577 Oxford St. East
London ON  N5Y 3H9
Canada
Phone: (519) 679-3450
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Simon Dental Centre
16775 Younge Street
Suite 400
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8J4
Canada
Phone: (905) 830-1230
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Interface
220 Oxford Street West
London ON  N6H 1S4
Canada
Phone: (519) 433-8333
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Ave. West
P.O. Box 2030
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Canada
Phone: (519) 352-6401
County: County of Kent
Electoral District: 01

Strathroy Middlesex General Hospita
395 Carrie St.
Strathroy ON  N9G 3J4
Canada
Phone: (519) 245-5295
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Pediatric Dentistry and Orthodontic
577 Oxford St. East
London ON  N5Y 3H9
Canada
Phone: (519) 679-3450
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

158 Bobcaygeon Road,
P.O. Box 279
Minden ON  K0M 2K0
Canada
Phone: (705) 286-3080
Fax: (705) 286-5080
County: County of Haliburton
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gary S. Simon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 05 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Simon ( CPSO# 53573 )
Dr. D. Brownstone ( CPSO# 50215 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anesthesiology
Room C2-166 PO Box 5010
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8300

Business Address:
51 Bracebridge Court
London ON  N5X 3V2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 23 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GARY SHERWIN SIMON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1985