Simon, Lisa Deborah (CPSO#: 83173)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
15 Sperling Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6K9
Phone: (705) 721-7520 Ext. 7244
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist
Community Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA DEBORAH SIMON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2011