Simon, Sonia Henry (CPSO#: 81438)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Al-Mustansiriyah, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough Hospital
Grace Campus
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone: (416) 495-2400
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

4839 Leslie street(nymark plaza)
North York ON  M2J 2K8
Canada
Phone: 416 498 0808
Fax: 416 498 1211
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

4839 Leslie street(nymark plaza)
North York ON  M2J 2K8
Canada
Phone: 416 498 0808
Fax: 416 498 1211
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sonia Simon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 10 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Simon ( CPSO# 81438 )

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital
Grace Campus
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2400

Business Address:
4839 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2J 2K8
Phone Number: (416) 498-3600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 11 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SONIA HENRY SIMON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 13 Sep 2004
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 14 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2009