Simone, Angelo Michael (CPSO#: 62617)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Oct 1991

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
2338 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5B 1N1
Phone: (905) 848-8303
Fax: (905) 848-5727
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Angelo Simone Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 02 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Simone ( CPSO# 62617 )

Business Address:
Suite 200
2338 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5B 1N1
Phone Number: (905) 848-8303

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 08 Sep 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANGELO MICHAEL SIMONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMONE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 1991

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: September 7, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)