Simone, Carmine (CPSO#: 72712)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto East General Hospital
G2 Chest Centre
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 465-9133
Fax: (416) 465-9584
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Carmine Simone Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Simone ( CPSO# 72712 )

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
G2 Chest Centre
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 465-9133

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CARMINE SIMONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMONE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 6 - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004