Simons, Derek Brent (CPSO#: 64302)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Minnesota

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 22 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEREK BRENT SIMONS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMONS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1992