Simons, Frances Elinor (CPSO#: 90324)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Hospital for Sick Children 555 University Avenue Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Date Received: 01 Jun 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016