Simons, Janet (CPSO#: 97600)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Health Sciences Centre Room 3N26D 1200 Main Street West Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Date Received: 13 Jul 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Biochemistry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jul 2017