Simor, Andrew Eugene (CPSO#: 29360)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 May 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 May 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
Room B103
Department Of Microbiology
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4549
Fax: (416) 480-6990
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Infectious Diseases Effective: 06 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 14 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW EUGENE SIMOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMOR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Aug 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 1984