Simpson, Alexander Ian Frederic (CPSO#: 92733)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 May 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 20 May 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Otago, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C A M H
Forensic Program
Unit 3 Fourth Floor
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 32994
Fax: (416) 583-4319
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Zealand

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 May 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 06 Jul 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 06 Aug 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 14 May 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 14 May 2015 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Alexander Ian Frederic Simpson may practise medicine only,

                        (i)   in  a  setting  that  is approved by the Chair, Department of
                              Psychiatry, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Simpson holds
                              an academic appointment  at  the rank of Associate Professor,
                              and
                  
                        (ii)  in accordance with the requirement of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Simpson no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.