Simpson, Cheryl Lynn (CPSO#: 91295)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Mar 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 36
3rd Floor
1960 Appleby Line
Burlington ON  L7L 0B7
Phone: (905) 315-9929
Fax: (905) 315-9314
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cheryl Simpson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Simpson ( CPSO# 91295 )

Business Address:
36 - 1960 Appleby Line
Burlington ON  L7L 0B7
Phone Number: (905) 315-9929

Business Address:
1230 Northshore Boulevard East
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 632-3730

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jan 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHERYL LYNN SIMPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMPSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 14 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 15 Jan 2012 to 29 Apr 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2012