Simpson, Diana Lee (CPSO#: 73760)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 04 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 05 Jun 2001 to 03 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 04 Jun 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 2007