Simpson, Kathleen Linda (CPSO#: 69559)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional Hospital
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-7200
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. L. Simpson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Simpson ( CPSO# 69559 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Hospital
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-7200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Atikokan General Hospital Atikokan
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHLEEN LINDA SIMPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMPSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 05 Sep 2000 to 04 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 05 Sep 2001 to 28 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1995