Simpson, Lynn Louise (CPSO#: 59948)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 May 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 May 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 May 2006