Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Simpson, Mia Benita (CPSO#: 65605)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Campus Health Centre
St. Lawrence College
P O Box 6000 Station Main
Kingston ON  K7L 5A6
Phone: (613) 544-5400 Ext. 1136
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MIA BENITA SIMPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMPSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1993