Simpson, Richard Brian (CPSO#: 24669)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 50
1064 Ave Bernard
Outremont QC  H2V 1V2
Phone: (514) 954-8989
Fax: (514) 544-7376

Medical Records Location

Address: 50 - 1064 AV BERNARD OUTREMONT, QC H2V 1V2
Date Received: 08 May 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018