Simpson, Robert Clifford (CPSO#: 51804)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Nov 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Nov 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
197 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N8
Phone: (519) 322-1100
Fax: (519) 322-2055
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Simpson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 23 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Simpson ( CPSO# 51804 )

Business Address:
Suite 101
197 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N8
Phone Number: (519) 322-1100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT CLIFFORD SIMPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMPSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Nov 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Aug 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 1989