Simpson, Thomas Harry (CPSO#: 52298)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 02 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jun 2005