Simson, Stanley Eugene (CPSO#: 17049)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 31 Dec 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Docudavit Solutions 28 Eugene Street Toronto ON M6B 3Z4 Phone: 416-781-9083 Toll Free: 1-888-781-9083 Fax: 1-866-297-9338
Date Received: 04 Jun 2014


Address: Accuro Health Services Division of Gamma-Dynacare Medical Laboratories Suite 412 1230 Old Innes Road Ottawa ON K1B 3V3 Telephone: 613-738-1242
Date Received: 13 Dec 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 05 Dec 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1959
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 2013