Simunovic, Marko Roderick (CPSO#: 59900)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Hospital
Department of Surgery B3
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 575-6375
Fax: (905) 381-7071
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Simunovic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 19 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Simunovic ( CPSO# 59900 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Cancer Centre
Department of Surgical Oncology
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 575-6365

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 04 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARKO RODERICK SIMUNOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMUNOVIC is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1992