Simurda, Michael Andrew (CPSO#: 14386)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1953

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1960 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1953
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jan 1961
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2000