Sinasac, Sarah Elizabeth (CPSO#: 84500)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peel Regional Cancer Program
4th Floor
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 1841
Fax: (905) 813-4024
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sarah Sinasac Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sinasac ( CPSO# 84500 )

Business Address:
Peel Regional Cancer Program
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
4th Floor
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Gynecologic Oncology Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH ELIZABETH SINASAC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINASAC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011