Sinclair, John Norman (CPSO#: 14213)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1953

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 15 Nov 1960 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1953
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Sep 1959
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1960
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jun 2000