Sinclair, John (CPSO#: 69899)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Neurosurgery
Civic Campus
The Ottawa Hospital
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-5383
Fax: (613) 761-4767
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Sinclair Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 14 2016

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN SINCLAIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINCLAIR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2002