Sinclair, Lesley Anne (CPSO#: 55576)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Feb 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesia, M3200
Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4969
Fax: (416) 480-6039
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L.A. Sinclair Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 09 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Sinclair ( CPSO# 55576 )

Business Address:
Department of Anaesthesia, M3 200
Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4969

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 06 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LESLEY ANNE SINCLAIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINCLAIR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 1987