Sinclair, Stephen Blair (CPSO#: 55300)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Feb 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen B. Sinclair Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 23 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sinclair ( CPSO# 55300 )

Business Address:
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-2310

Business Address:
Suite 315
250 Harding Blvd West
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone Number: (905) 770-4560

Business Address:
Suite 200
4610 Hwy 7 West
Woodbridge ON  L4L 4Y7
Phone Number: (905) 856-2626

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 18 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN BLAIR SINCLAIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINCLAIR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Feb 1988