Sinclair, Thomas Marc (CPSO#: 58650)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Jun 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jun 1996