Singal, Mayank (CPSO#: 97436)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Jul 2011 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Nov 2013 to 29 Dec 2013
Elective Trainee - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jul 2014