Singal, Neera (CPSO#: 71578)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 340
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 979-9993
Fax: (416) 979-9099
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Neera Singal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 19 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Singal ( CPSO# 71578 )

Business Address:
Unit 340
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 979-7711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEERA SINGAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002