Singal, Rajiv Kumar (CPSO#: 62494)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 218
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone: (416) 469-3314
Fax: (416) 469-2511
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rajiv K. Singal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 05 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Singal ( CPSO# 62494 )

Business Address:
Suite 218
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone Number: (416) 469-3314

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 10 Sep 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAJIV KUMAR SINGAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1991