Singer, Abraham (CPSO#: 28909)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 May 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 May 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hebrew, Yiddish

Education:McGill University, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1977 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Nov 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 May 2005