Singer, Gabrielle Tsipora (CPSO#: 77626)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2005

Summary

Former Name: Farkas, Gabrielle Tsipora (used until: 20 Jul 2004 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10 Senlac Road
Toronto ON  M2N 6P8
Phone: 416 250 7029
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GABRIELLE TSIPORA SINGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 13 Jan 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 14 Jan 2003 to 17 Nov 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 18 Nov 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 19 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2005