Singer, Henry Norman (CPSO#: 18519)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Apr 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Apr 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Singer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 7 2013

Medical Records Location

Address: KISS Storage (416)-663-5477
Instructions: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact KISS Storage by telephone. If KISS Storange does not have the medical records, patients may contact the College for further assistance.
Date Received: 22 Jun 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 16 Nov 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Apr 2017