Singer, Jeffrey Stephen (CPSO#: 88032)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jan 2008 to 15 Feb 2008
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2008 to 30 Apr 2008
Elective Trainee - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 May 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Feb 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008