Singer, Lianne Gail (CPSO#: 66503)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
11 PMB 134
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-4996
Fax: (416) 340-3609
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lianne Singer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 14 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Singer ( CPSO# 66503 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
11 PMB 134
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-4996

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick
Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 16 Sep 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LIANNE GAIL SINGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1997