Singer, Michael Oran (CPSO#: 75829)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jan 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Medical Clinic
Unit 212
10720 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3C9
Phone: (905) 884-5678
Fax: (905) 884-3791
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 24 May 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL ORAN SINGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2001