Singer, Robert Harry (CPSO#: 52157)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1986

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3497 Fairview Street
Burlington ON  L7N 2R4
Phone: (905) 681-3315
Fax: (905) 681-6327
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Singer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 01 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Singer ( CPSO# 52157 )

Business Address:
3497 Fairview Street
Burlington ON  L7N 2R4
Phone Number: (905) 681-3315

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 25 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT HARRY SINGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1986

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence

On June 29, 2016, at the Superior Court of Justice in Milton, Ontario, a finding of professional negligence was made against Dr. Singer in respect of an incident that took place in October 2007.