Singh, Arjune Beharry (CPSO#: 65418)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Delhi, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HUMBER RIVER HOSPITAL
WILSON SITE
1235 WILSON AVE
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARJUNE BEHARRY SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Expiry date attached to Certificate of Registration Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1993