Singh, Artaj (CPSO#: 56630)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Primary Care Niagara
6150 Valley Way
Suite 104
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 1Y3
Phone: (905) 371-1881
Fax: (905) 371-1888
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Primary Care Niagara
800 Niagara Street North
Suite G1
Welland ON  L3C 5Z4
Canada
Phone: (905) 732-4451 Ext. 200
Fax: (905) 732-1330
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Colorado
USA - Indiana
USA - Kentucky
USA - Ohio

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Feb 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARTAJ SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1988