Singh, Baljit (CPSO#: 75746)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Sep 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Sep 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Osmania University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
481 London Road
Sarnia ON  N7T 4X3
Phone: (519) 491-1110
Fax: (519) 491-1109
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Baljit Singh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 07 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Singh ( CPSO# 75746 )

Business Address:
481 London Road
Sarnia ON  N7T 4X3
Phone Number: (519) 491-1110

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 02 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BALJIT SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 16 Nov 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2002