Singh, Balraj (CPSO#: 106312)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 20 Nov 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Nov 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Baba Farid University Of Health Sciences, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 22 Sep 2015
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 28 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 29 Aug 2017 to 20 Nov 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Nov 2017