Singh, Birinder (CPSO#: 83647)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Eglinton Station Medical Centre
1 Eglinton Ave. E., Suite 604
Toronto ON  M4P 3A1
Phone: (416) 485-0555
Fax: (416) 485-2555
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Birinder Singh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Singh ( CPSO# 83647 )

Business Address:
Eglinton Station Medical Centre
Suite 604
1 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 3A1
Phone Number: (416) 485-0555

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Aug 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BIRINDER SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2005 to 31 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2006 to 26 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2007