Singh, Brijmohan (CPSO#: 63613)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Mar 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Utkal University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Boca Raton Regional Hospital
800 Meadows Road
Boca Raton, Fl 33486
Boca Raton FL  33486
United States
Phone: (561) 955-5117
Fax: (561) 955-5140

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 25 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIJMOHAN SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Research Fellows - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 1993