Singh, Dhssraj (CPSO#: 108015)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Oct 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Oct 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Malay, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:National University of Ireland, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Heart Institute
2464 Howard Avenue, Suite 201
Windsor
Ontario
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone: (519) 977-6643
Fax: (519) 915-6326
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

C/O Renee Sperduti, Dept of Int.Med
Windsor Regional Hospital- Ouellett
1030 Ouellete Avenue
Windsor ON
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Canada
Phone: 519-973-4411
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Windsor Regional Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Canada
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dhssraj Singh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Van ( CPSO# 90803 )
Dr. D. Singh ( CPSO# 108015)

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4411

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 973-4411

Business Address:
1464 Howard Avenue
Suite 201
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 977-6643

Business Address:
Chatham Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Avenue
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Phone Number: (519) 352-6400

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 01 Oct 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Mar 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Apr 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Mar 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 07 Apr 2017 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Dhssraj Singh may practise medicine independently in cardiology.