Singh, Evelyn Hemwantie (CPSO#: 22101)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jan 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jan 2015

Summary

Former Names: Doobay, Evelyn Hemwantie (used until: 01 May 2001 )     Doobay, Evelyn Hemwantie (used until: 30 Apr 2001 )     Singh, Evelyn Hemwantie (used until: 08 Apr 2001 )     Singh, Evelyn Hemwantie (used until: 31 Aug 1988 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: DocuDavit Solutions 28 Eugene Street Toronto ON M6B 3Z4 Tel: 416-781-9083 or 1-888-781-9083 Fax: 1-866-297-9338 Website: http://www.docudavit.com
Date Received: 23 Dec 2014

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 2015