Singh, Gita (CPSO#: 75171)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Boxgrove Medical Centre
204-110 Copper Creek Drive
Markham ON  L6B 0P9
Phone: (905) 471-8222
Fax: (905) 471-8822
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gita Singh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 22 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Singh ( CPSO# 75171 )

Business Address:
Boxgrove Medical Centre
204 - 110 Copper Creek Drive
Markham ON  L6B 0P9
Phone Number: (905) 471-8222

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GITA SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2006