Singh, Indarjit (CPSO#: 20865)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sheffield, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 15 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Sep 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1992