Singh, Jagdeep (CPSO#: 91325)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 50554
Fax: (905) 494-6481
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Singh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Singh ( CPSO# 91325 )

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 May 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAGDEEP SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 21 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2010